Almutairy, Maha A R (CPSO#: 78901)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2003 to 29 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005