Almutawa, Mohammad (CPSO#: 92476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Alberta Hospital
W M C, 2C2
Department of Cardiology
8440 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-8822

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ALMUTAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMUTAWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017