Alnahdi, Haifa Munif A (CPSO#: 100081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196612111 Ext. 87675
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAIFA MUNIF A ALNAHDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALNAHDI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALNAHDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALNAHDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALNAHDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALNAHDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALNAHDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018