Alnaif, Bunan (CPSO#: 65679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3806 Poplar Hill Road
Suite B
Chesapeake VA  23321
United States
Phone: (757) 484-7200
Fax: (757) 484-2323

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BUNAN ALNAIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAIF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996