Alnaji, Fuad Saeed A (CPSO#: 84154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Deptartment of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Alnaji ( CPSO# 84154 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Departmentt of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FUAD SAEED A ALNAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011