Alnaqbi, Abdalla Rashid Saeed Khalfan (CPSO#: 82264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
zayed military hospital
zayed military hospital
arabian gulf street
abudhabi
abudhabi 3740
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97124448100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDALLA RASHID SAEED KHALFAN ALNAQBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAQBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 29 May 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2010