Alnassar, Mu'taz Morshed Abdallah (CPSO#: 87135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2012

Expiry Date:  01 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75303
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jordan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mu'taz Morshed Abdallah Alnassar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  Division  of Paediatric Radiology, McMaster University,
                        in which Dr. Alnassar holds  an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Alnassar  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Alnassar's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when   the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about   Dr.   Alnassar's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 2, 2012.  In accordance with paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration
                  Committee, automatically expire on May 1, 2019.