Alnosair, Ashraf Ali S (CPSO#: 92087)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010