Alobaid, Abdulhakeem Mohammed S (CPSO#: 80638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of General Surgery
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

HÔPITAL NOTRE-DAME HOSPITAL
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hakeem Alobaid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alobaid ( CPSO# 80638 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of General Surgery
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
HGPITAL Norte-Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULHAKEEM MOHAMMED S ALOBAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOBAID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2004 to 15 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2012