Alobaid, Abdullah Omar A (CPSO#: 86163)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 03 Jul 2007
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2007 to 03 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2008 to 03 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2009 to 03 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2010 to 03 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2011 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014