Alobida, Hussam Walid I (CPSO#: 111597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
585 University Avenue
11 Pmb 139C
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSAM WALID I ALOBIDA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALOBIDA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALOBIDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOBIDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOBIDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALOBIDA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALOBIDA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Mar 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2018