Alodan, Khalid Abdullah N (CPSO#: 108816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2016

Expiry Date:  29 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID ABDULLAH N ALODAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALODAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALODAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALODAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALODAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALODAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALODAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 29 May 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 May 2018