Alofisan, Tariq Othman M (CPSO#: 104045)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017