Alohali, Ahmed Fathe A (CPSO#: 110233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 16 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 667-6577
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED FATHE A ALOHALI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALOHALI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALOHALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOHALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOHALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALOHALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALOHALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018