Alomair, Maryam Abdulateef M (CPSO#: 105604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiac Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM ABDULATEEF M ALOMAIR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALOMAIR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALOMAIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOMAIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOMAIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALOMAIR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALOMAIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018