Alomari, Mohammad Ghaleb (CPSO#: 88235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52244
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alomari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alomari ( CPSO# 88235 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD GHALEB ALOMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOMARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009