Aloraini, Abdullah Mohammed S (CPSO#: 102301)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2013 to 02 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015