Alotaibi, Abdulnasir Mohammed H (CPSO#: 110430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Diseases
Black Wing 7th Floor Room 7315
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6273
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULNASIR MOHAMMED H ALOTAIBI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALOTAIBI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOTAIBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALOTAIBI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018