Alowami, Salem Omar Saeed (CPSO#: 69309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Room L 222 6
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35186
Fax: (905) 521-6192
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEM OMAR SAEED ALOWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOWAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006