Alowibidy, Bander Eid Awad (CPSO#: 97239)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jan 2012 to 24 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2012 to 02 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 2013