Alpar, Andrew (CPSO#: 54308)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997