Alpert, Brian (CPSO#: 50072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Jacobs Pain Centre
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough North Multidisciplinary
Assessment Centre
P H 12
4168 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 5H6
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-0890
Fax: (416) 321-0991
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Pain & Disability Assessment Centre
Unit 10
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 640-5799
Fax: (416) 512-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Alpert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Alpert ( CPSO# 50072 )

Business Address:
The Jacobs Pain Centre
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Business Address:
Pain & Disability Assessment Centre
Unit 10
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 640-5799

Business Address:
4168 Finch Avenue East
PH 12
Toronto ON  M1S 5H6
Phone Number: (416) 321-0890

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ALPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALPERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995