Alqahtani, Abdulrahman Mubarak (CPSO#: 88242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Otago, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
865 Regent St S
Sudbury ON  P3Y 3Y9
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Alqahtani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alqahtani ( CPSO# 88242 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN MUBARAK ALQAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012