Alqahtani, Hanan Mohammad A (CPSO#: 110527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 07 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
Box 232 Rm 1466e
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73249
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANAN MOHAMMAD A ALQAHTANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2016 to 06 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018