Alqahtani, Manaf Mohamed Mubarak Mohamed (CPSO#: 79317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Medical services- BDF Hospita
650808, West Riffa
Bahrain
Riffa 650808
Bahrain
Phone: +973 17766666 Ext. 6575
Fax: +973 17320283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahrain

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAF MOHAMED MUBARAK MOHAMED ALQAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2003 to 24 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 04 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2005 to 04 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2006 to 04 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2007 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010