Alqoofi, Faisal Turki Y (CPSO#: 75808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 21 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Dec 2001 to 21 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Dec 2002 to 21 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2010