Alrashed, Abdulaziz Ahmad Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 95667)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014