Alrashid, Ali T A M (CPSO#: 108188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Murray Koffler Urolgoic Wellness
Centre 6th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-6367
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI T A M ALRASHID may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALRASHID is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALRASHID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALRASHID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALRASHID shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALRASHID ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALRASHID ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 23 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018