Alrowaished, Abdulellah Abdulmohsen Saad (CPSO#: 94563)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012