Alsadoon, Abdulaziz Abdulfattah Y (CPSO#: 86062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alsadoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ ABDULFATTAH Y ALSADOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSADOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012