Alsalami, Zahraa Barwaji (CPSO#: 94395)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 01 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012