Alsalmi, Loai Abdullah A (CPSO#: 86615)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2007 to 04 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2007