Alsayegh, Eman A H M E (CPSO#: 102647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 514-451-4581
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAN A H M E ALSAYEGH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALSAYEGH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALSAYEGH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSAYEGH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSAYEGH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALSAYEGH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALSAYEGH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018