Alsenosy, Nafa Alzarook Musbah (CPSO#: 88315)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2011