Alshammari, Kanan Mamdouh K (CPSO#: 110269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 30 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANAN MAMDOUH K ALSHAMMARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALSHAMMARI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALSHAMMARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSHAMMARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSHAMMARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALSHAMMARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALSHAMMARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018