Alshangiti, Abdulraheem Ahmed A (CPSO#: 107600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 64786
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULRAHEEM AHMED A ALSHANGITI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALSHANGITI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALSHANGITI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSHANGITI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSHANGITI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALSHANGITI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALSHANGITI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Nov 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2017