Alshareef, Maram Hashim A (CPSO#: 104997)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 31 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016