Alshehhi, Maryam Hasan Abdulla Darwish (CPSO#: 88291)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Oct 2009 to 02 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Oct 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 10 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2014