Alsinan, Basheer Abdullah (CPSO#: 89831)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 25 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2010