Alsolu, Hani Naji Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 79212)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008