Alsowat, Daad Khalaf M (CPSO#: 110251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 17 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAAD KHALAF M ALSOWAT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALSOWAT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALSOWAT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSOWAT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSOWAT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALSOWAT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALSOWAT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018