Alsuhibani, Waleed Ibrahim Mohammed (CPSO#: 81244)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jul 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011