Alsuwaidan, Mohammad T M S (CPSO#: 82361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
9th Floor MP Room 325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 6508
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD T M S ALSUWAIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSUWAIDAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 2005 to 29 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010