Alsuwailem, Bader Yousef A (CPSO#: 110368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3275
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BADER YOUSEF A ALSUWAILEM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALSUWAILEM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALSUWAILEM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSUWAILEM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSUWAILEM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALSUWAILEM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALSUWAILEM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Aug 2016
PEAP - Resident - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018