Altaf, Fawaz Mohammed Nour Saeed (CPSO#: 76836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
911 Queen's Blvd
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: 519 7443311
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

grand river hospital
835 king street west
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 5197494300 Ext. 3892
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 02 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAWAZ MOHAMMED NOUR SAEED ALTAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012