Alter, David Andrew (CPSO#: 62441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 109
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 878-9805
Fax: (905) 878-6358
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heartwise Diagnostics
250 Harding Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-0422
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Healthwise Diagnostics
Suite 100
12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 695-5665
Fax: (905) 695-5666
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Cardiac Rehab
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 5267
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Alter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mandel ( CPSO# 62513 )
Dr. D. Alter ( CPSO# 62441 )

Business Address:
Heartwise Diagnostics
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0422

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 480-5838

Business Address:
Heartwise Diagnostics
100 - 12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 695-5665

Business Address:
347 Ramsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
311 Commercial Street
Suite 109
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW ALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991