Alterkait, Ahmed Hani Abdulaziz Hussain A (CPSO#: 84318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED HANI ABDULAZIZ HUSSAIN A ALTERKAIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTERKAIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 May 2006 to 26 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 27 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2014