Althunayan, Abdulaziz Mohammed A (CPSO#: 104104)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016