Altman, David Lorne (CPSO#: 82523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forest Hill Family Health Centre
Suite 200
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto M5N 1A8
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 782-6111 Ext. 125
Fax: (416) 782-5515
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. L. Altman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Altman ( CPSO# 82523 )

Business Address:
Forest Hill Family Health Centre
200 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 782-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LORNE ALTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008