Altomare, Filiberto (CPSO#: 64016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3708
Fax: (416) 867-7482
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Filiberto Altomare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Altomare ( CPSO# 64016 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3708

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILIBERTO ALTOMARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTOMARE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992